House
|
03/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3023) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:01PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EET/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|