Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kim. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to TCA/EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |