Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |