Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2652) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |