House
|
03/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1242-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3047) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2570) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-14-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:32PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|