Senate | 02/12/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported from PSM/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | The committee(s) on PSM/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to PSM/CPN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |