Senate
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 248, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 248, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (6) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard, Richards). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Holt, Takayama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Holt, Takayama, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Lamosao, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos, Lamosao, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2941) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2653) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|