House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2840) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |