Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |