House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 223). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | One Day Notice 03-05-24. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to TCA/AEN. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |