Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Act 017, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Act 017, on 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1117).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Onishi, Pierick, Tam, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Inouye, Richards, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 83-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 83-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Quinlan, Aiu, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, DeCoite, Rhoads, Hashimoto, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 1:30PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 1:30PM; Conference Room CR224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; DeCoite, Wakai, Rhoads, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Quinlan, Aiu Co-Chairs; Kila, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 713).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1846-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from HSG/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Miyake, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/TOU on Friday, 03-15-24 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HSG/TOU, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3014) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:31AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPN/EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 9:35AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CPN/EET/PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|