Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Act 127, 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Act 127, on 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 122-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 122-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Morikawa, Kahaloa, Kila, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tarnas.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 1:45PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 774).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Tarnas, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Kila, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Kanuha.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 539).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:05PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Re-referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 227) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3001) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2332) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|