House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-29-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2733) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-14-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|