Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2592) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to TCA/AEN, CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |