House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 674).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2054), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|