House
|
03/20/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1209-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2794) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2297) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|