LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB3012
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB3012
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB3012
Action History
Senate
02/13/2024
The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Senate
02/08/2024
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-13-24 3:01PM; CR 224.
Senate
02/05/2024
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/26/2024
Referred to TCA, WAM.
Senate
01/24/2024
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/24/2024
Introduced.