Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from PSM/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-02-24 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to PSM/HWN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|