House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:44PM in Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:00PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:30AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 9:30AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Todd, Sayama, Kila Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 702).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Kanuha.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 682).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1792-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1088-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3039) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2690) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|