Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2587) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to GVO, WAM/CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |