Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HOU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto, Aquino. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |