Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported from LBT/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT/EDU deferred the measure until 02-09-24 3:00PM; CR 229. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to LBT/EDU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |