Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Act 125, 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Act 125, on 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 112-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 112-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nishimoto, Holt, Kila; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Lee, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Holt, Kila, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Keohokalole.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 722).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1827-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3028) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HWN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|