Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2152) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |