Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2464) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-07-24 1:00PM; CR 225. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HHS, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |