Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2562) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |