Senate | 02/13/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella, Lee. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to LBT, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |