Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 343).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 466).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cochran, Holt, Hussey-Burdick, Perruso, Poepoe, Souza voting no (6) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Gates voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Holt, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe, Souza voting no (8) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1341-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt, Souza; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2836) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-27-24 9:31AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|