12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced. |