Senate | 02/28/2024 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2559) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to CPN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |