House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 291).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2887) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|