House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 295) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2847) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Re-Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|