Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2357) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to TCA, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |