Senate | 02/09/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |