Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |