Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Act 039, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Act 039, on 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Hashem, Holt, Hussey-Burdick, Ichiyama, Kapela, Kobayashi, Kong, Marten, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Onishi, Perruso, Poepoe, Quinlan, Sayama, Takayama, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (22) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 16; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Gabbard, McKelvey, Moriwaki. Noes, 9 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCoite, Elefante, Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara, Inouye, Kim, Rhoads). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 149-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 149-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Tarnas, Kila, Morikawa, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Lee, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:00 PM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-24 11:00AM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Kila, Morikawa, Todd, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Hashimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 726).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos, Belatti, Chun, Garcia, Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Onishi, Poepoe, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garrett, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Chun, Hashem, Kapela, Marten, M. Mizuno, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Cochran, Garcia, Garrett, Hussey-Burdick, Kobayashi, Kong, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Onishi, Perruso, Sayama, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Lowen, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from HSG/WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Chun; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL/JHA on Monday, 04-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 302) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara, Rhoads). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2951) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-24 1:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|