House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Amato, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:31AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AEN/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2604) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-15-24 3:01PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:02PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-13-24 3:01PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to AEN/TCA, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|