House
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Gates, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 310) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|