House
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2980) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2352) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|