Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |