House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 316) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2867) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|