House
|
03/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2756) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|