House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on CPN has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 02-27-24 10:01AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2692) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-13-24 3:01PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to TCA, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|