House
|
04/09/2024
|
Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kila, Sayama, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Cochran, Evslin, Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Kobayashi, Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (12) and Representative(s) Gates, Souza excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1784-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kobayashi, Poepoe; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 17) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-20-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2511) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|