Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 085, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 085, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 69-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 69-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Tarnas, Martinez, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Kanuha, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 804).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Wakai.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 549).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-03-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 321) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2899) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|