Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from WTL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Referred to WTL/CPN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |