House
|
03/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LGO with Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LGO.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Matayoshi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDN, LGO, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 324) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2919) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to EDU, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|