House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2770) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|