Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:05PM; CR 224. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |