Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:05PM; CR 224. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced. |